Ali Al-Kazely, Luay Hussein (CPSO#: 87421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nebo Medical Center
260 Nebo road
Unit #1
Hamilton ON  L8W 3K5
Phone: (905) 381-9800
Fax: (905) 381-9807
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

18 plains road west
unit 2
Burlington ON  L7T 0B3
Canada
Phone: (905) 218-6444
Fax: (905) 521-2775
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

370 Argyle Street South
Caledonia ON  N3W 2N2
Canada
Phone: (289) 960-0733
Fax: (289) 960-0739
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luay Ali Al-Kazely Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ali Al-Kazely ( CPSO# 87421 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
18 Plains Road West
Hamilton ON  L7T 0B3

Business Address:
370 Argyle Street South
Caledonia ON  N3W 2N2
Phone Number: (289) 960-0733

Business Address:
1 - 260 Nebo Road
Hamilton ON  L8W 3K5
Phone Number: (905) 381-9800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUAY HUSSEIN ALI AL-KAZELY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI AL-KAZELY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2007

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 14, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 14, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)