Ali, Anwar Mohammad Ahmad Hussein (CPSO#: 82321)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 11 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2005 to 27 Jun 2005
PEAP - Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 28 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2015