Ali, Durya (CPSO#: 86156)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3100
222 King St E
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 440-3600
Fax: (905) 697-7745
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

A2B-5995 14th Avenue
Markham ON  L3S0A2
Canada
Phone: 289 859 9901
Fax: 905 201 6565
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Durya Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ali ( CPSO# 86156 )

Business Address:
Suite 3100
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 440-3600

Business Address:
Unit A2B
5995 14th Avenue
Markham ON  L3S 4S1
Phone Number: (289) 859-9901

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DURYA ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009