Ali, Madi Mohamed Madi (CPSO#: 75546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main Street West Room 248
P O Box 2000
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46698
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Madi Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ali ( CPSO# 75546 )

Business Address:
200 James Street South
Suite 301
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A9
Phone Number: (905) 525-8607

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MADI MOHAMED MADI ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2001 to 30 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2002 to 30 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2003 to 30 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2004 to 30 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2006