Ali, Salim Rashed Mosabah (CPSO#: 78432)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 12 Aug 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Aug 2003