Ali, Samia Hamid Ahmed (CPSO#: 81314)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Khartoum, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120 Ext. 58439
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V1R8
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S0A9
Canada
Phone: 9053784647 Ext. 43128
Fax: 9057044195
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Advance Endoscopy
2227 S Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Canada
Phone: (905) 569-7007
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samia H. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ali ( CPSO# 81314 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
2227 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R3
Phone Number: (905) 569-7007

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Phone Number: (807) 274-3261

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Sudan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMIA HAMID AHMED ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 03 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 04 Apr 2010 to 03 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 04 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2011