Alija, Agron (CPSO#: 91203)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Albanian, Croatian, English, German, Serbian

Education:UNIVERSITY OF PRISTINA, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Active Care Medical Centre
201-1807 Wonderland Rd. N
London ON  N6A 5C2
Phone: (519) 433-2996
Fax: (519) 433-4332
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Four Counties Health Services
R R 3
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Canada
Phone: (519) 693-4441
Fax: (519) 693-7084
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Alija Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alija ( CPSO# 91203 )

Business Address:
SouthWestern Medical Centre
813 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H6
Phone Number: (519) 433-4330

Business Address:
1824 Concession Drive
RR #3
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Phone Number: (519) 653-4441

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AGRON ALIJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2013