Aliyarzadeh, Hoda (CPSO#: 97734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
123 Edward Street, Suite 400
Toronto ON  M5G1E2
Phone: 4165970997
Fax: 4165972912
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aliyarzadeh & Yazdan-Ashoori Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Yazdan-Ashoori ( CPSO# 97716 )
Dr. H. Aliyarzadeh ( CPSO# 97734 )

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4

Business Address:
Unit 12
Level 2
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2

Business Address:
Suite 002
10350 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5K9

Business Address:
123 Edward Street
Suite 400
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HODA ALIYARZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIYARZADEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 18 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014