Aljassem, Kinda (CPSO#: 95364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2-1664 Dufferin St, Toronto
Toronto ON  M6H3M1
Phone: 416-652-0606
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Aljassem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Aljassem ( CPSO# 95364 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1
Phone Number: (647) 531-2529

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Aug 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KINDA ALJASSEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALJASSEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 07 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2016 to 13 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2017