Alkhamesi, Nawar Abdul Hadi Saleh (CPSO#: 94239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room C8- 116
PO Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3985
Fax: (519) 663-3052
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alkhamesi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Alkhamesi ( CPSO# 94239 )

Business Address:
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room C8-116
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3985

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAWAR ABDUL HADI SALEH ALKHAMESI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALKHAMESI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Jul 2010 to 27 Aug 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2015