Alkhouly, Khalid Abas Abo Almagd (CPSO#: 82334)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tanta University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2005 to 20 Jun 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 21 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Nov 2007
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2007