Allain, Dominic Jules-Francois (CPSO#: 82034)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Nov 2004 to 12 Dec 2004
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2009 to 31 May 2009
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2009