Allan, Rodney Stewart (CPSO#: 81497)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of New South Wales, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 20 Aug 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 20 Jan 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jan 2006