Allard, Marc Louis (CPSO#: 76467)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 205
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone: (905) 497-7747
Fax: (905) 497-7748
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc Allard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Allard ( CPSO# 76467 )

Business Address:
205 - 10 Cotrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone Number: (905) 497-7747

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC LOUIS ALLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005