Allen, Albert Nguyenhoang (CPSO#: 88359)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 703
1849 Yonge St.
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone: (647) 557-3622
Fax: 647-689-3288
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Asian Clinic
Hong Fook Mental Health Association
130 Dundas Street West, 3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 493-4242
Fax: (416) 595-6332
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The ADHD Clinic
1849 Yonge St.
Suite 711
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Canada
Phone: (416) 304-1779
Fax: (416) 304-0257
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Albert Allen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Allen ( CPSO# 88359 )

Business Address:
1849 Yonge Street
Suite 703 & 711
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (647) 557-3622

Business Address:
3rd Floor
130 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M5G 1C3
Phone Number: (416) 493-4242

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALBERT NGUYENHOANG ALLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013