Allen, David Macrae (CPSO#: 33268)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
935 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 2C6
Phone: 7056754883
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David M. Allen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 10 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MACRAE ALLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1982