Allibhai, Zishan (CPSO#: 81664)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6595
Fax: (905) 952-2818
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zishan Allibhai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Allibhai ( CPSO# 81664 )

Business Address:
5-620 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
Stronach Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 31 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZISHAN ALLIBHAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLIBHAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2009 to 31 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2013