Almadani, Entesar Mohammed Hasan (CPSO#: 80199)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Sep 2003 to 14 Oct 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Oct 2003 to 30 Sep 2004
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005