Almaghlouth, Ibrahim Ali S (CPSO#: 97300)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vibrant Medical Clinic
100 - 2640 Rutherford Rd
Concord ON  L4K 0H3
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 24 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IBRAHIM ALI S ALMAGHLOUTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMAGHLOUTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2012 to 27 Apr 2012
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2018