Almahmeed, Buthaina A A Y (CPSO#: 90305)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Mar 2009 to 24 May 2009
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 11 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 12 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Aug 2014