Almajid, Khalid Saeed M (CPSO#: 89357)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Etobicoke Children's Clinic
Unit 103
40 Westmore Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4C2
Phone: 416-745-4050
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rutherford Medical Centre
5283 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T2
Canada
Phone: 905-264-8311
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K.S.M. Almajid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Almajid ( CPSO# 89357 )

Business Address:
North Etobicoke Children's Clinic
103 - 40 Westmore Drive
Toronto ON  M9V 4C2
Phone Number: (416) 745-4050

Business Address:
3 - 5283 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T2
Phone Number: (905) 264-8311

Business Address:
3 - 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALID SAEED M ALMAJID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMAJID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jul 2008
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2008 to 30 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 21 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 22 Apr 2011 to 21 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 22 Apr 2012 to 12 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 13 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2017