Almakadi, Mohammed Saleh A (CPSO#: 90385)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Center
Division of Malignant Hematology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Fax: (905) 575-6340
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1280 Main Street West
MDCL 5116
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Canada
Phone: 9055259140 Ext. 21872
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammed Almakadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Almakadi ( CPSO# 90385 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Center
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
219 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2P 2W9
Phone Number: (905) 685-8082

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 30 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED SALEH A ALMAKADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMAKADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2009 to 26 Jun 2009
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2013