Almasswary, Adel Ali Mohamed (CPSO#: 81892)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2004 to 08 Oct 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 09 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008