Almogbel, Osama Abdullah S (CPSO#: 92754)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
11Pmb - 131
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: 6479551917
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Osama Almogbel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Almogbel ( CPSO# 92754 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Cardiology Department
11Pmb - 131
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (647) 955-1917

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OSAMA ABDULLAH S ALMOGBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMOGBEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2012