Almohri, Huda Ahmed Ghuloom Hasan (CPSO#: 84823)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone: (416) 675-4530 Ext. 42811
Fax: (416) 213-4206
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Haider Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Almohri ( CPSO# 84823 )
Dr. E. Haider ( CPSO# 84853 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Radiology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Room T0733
Hamilton ON  L7M 5B1

Business Address:
LifeLabs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUDA AHMED GHULOOM HASAN ALMOHRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMOHRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2007