Almutairi, Fawaz Qabel R (CPSO#: 89707)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 May 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2013