Alnaqbi, Khalid Abdalla Ali Abdalla Yarouf (CPSO#: 80291)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 14 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Nov 2003 to 19 Jan 2004
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012