Alnaqi, Amar A A (CPSO#: 95047)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kuwait University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Paediatric Surgery Effective: 02 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 02 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Pediatric General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Paediatric Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016