Alnhisi, Khaled Mohamed Abobakr (CPSO#: 94595)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grantham Medical Clinic
Unit B3
400 Scott Street
St Catharines ON  L2M 3W4
Phone: (905) 937-0000
Fax: (905) 937-0030
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alnhisi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Alnhisi ( CPSO# 94595 )

Business Address:
Grantham Medical Clinic
B3 - 400 Scott Street
St Catharines ON  L2M 3W4
Phone Number: (905) 937-0000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALED MOHAMED ABOBAKR ALNHISI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALNHISI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2011