Alnusif, Naser S A Y (CPSO#: 108447)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2018

Expiry Date:  31 Jul 2019

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 01 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare London
Division of Orthopedic Surgery
268 Grosvenor St
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASER S A Y ALNUSIF may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALNUSIF is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. ALNUSIF shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALNUSIF is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALNUSIF shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALNUSIF ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALNUSIF ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Jul 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Feb 2016 to 06 Mar 2016
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2018 to 31 Jul 2019
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2018