Alomani, Tareq A A A (CPSO#: 90257)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2009 to 04 May 2009
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 May 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016