Alomar, Abdulaziz Zamil M (CPSO#: 91877)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2012