Alotaibi, Abdullah Saad M (CPSO#: 92729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULLAH SAAD M ALOTAIBI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALOTAIBI is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. ALOTAIBI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALOTAIBI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALOTAIBI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALOTAIBI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALOTAIBI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 17 May 2010 to 24 Jun 2010
PEAP - Resident - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 25 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 May 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018