Alotaibi, Jawaher Mubarak S (CPSO#: 113730)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Aug 2017 to 22 Oct 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 23 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 04 Sep 2018
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Sep 2018