Alqahtani, Bader Awadh M (CPSO#: 114103)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 24 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Queen's University
70 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BADER AWADH M ALQAHTANI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALQAHTANI is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. ALQAHTANI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALQAHTANI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALQAHTANI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALQAHTANI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALQAHTANI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2017 to 23 Jan 2018
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Oct 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2018