Alqahtani, Rakan Mohammed D (CPSO#: 92727)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 17 May 2010 to 25 Jun 2010
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 18 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 19 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 2015