Alqahtani, Yahya Saad A (CPSO#: 113855)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2017 to 27 Oct 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 28 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Aug 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2018