Alqarawi, Wael Abdulrahman A (CPSO#: 94861)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7000
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAEL ABDULRAHMAN A ALQARAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALQARAWI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2011 to 08 May 2011
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2017