Alrowaily, Nouf Fraih D (CPSO#: 111361)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Obstetrics
and Gynaecology
3-903 - 700 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2017 to 12 Feb 2017
Elective Trainee - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2017