Alsaden, Mohamed-Rida Ahmed (CPSO#: 81705)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Henry Ford Hospital
2799 W. Grand Blvd.
Detroit MI  48202
United States
Phone: 313 2831082
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Aven.
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: 519-2545577 Ext. 52201
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Campus
Windsor ON  N9A1E1
Canada
Phone: 519-9734411
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Aug 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED-RIDA AHMED ALSADEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSADEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2005