Alsaggaf, Manal Ahmed A (CPSO#: 92148)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Oct 2009 to 07 Dec 2009
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Dec 2009 to 07 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Dec 2010 to 14 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Dec 2010 to 14 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Dec 2011 to 04 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Apr 2012 to 04 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2013 to 06 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2015 to 01 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 02 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016