Alsahli, Hamoud Sahi S (CPSO#: 114106)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2017

Expiry Date:  31 Oct 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 24 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Division of Neurology
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAMOUD SAHI S ALSAHLI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALSAHLI is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. ALSAHLI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALSAHLI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALSAHLI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALSAHLI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALSAHLI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Oct 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2017 to 23 Jan 2018
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jan 2018 to 31 Oct 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2018