Alsahli, Mazen (CPSO#: 92612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Mar 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aleppo, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
531 Davis Drive
Suite 309
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 898-6100
Fax: (905) 898-6105
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Belton Blvd
Suite 206
St Catharines ON  L2T 3Y4
Canada
Phone: (289) 362-5255
Fax: (905) 378-3370
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mazen Alsahli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alsahli ( CPSO# 92612 )

Business Address:
Suite 309
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 898-6100

Business Address:
1 Belton Boulevard
Suite 206
St Catharines ON  L2T 3Y4
Phone Number: (289) 362-5255

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Dec 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Mazen Alsahli may practice medicine independently in internal medicine and
            endocrinology, only.