Alsaleh, Yasser (CPSO#: 94830)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Damascus, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Feb 2011 to 12 May 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 13 May 2011 to 12 May 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 13 May 2012 to 28 Jan 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jan 2013