Alsanawi, Hisham Abdulaziz S (CPSO#: 89966)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2008 to 12 Dec 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 13 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 12 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2011