Alsayegh, Ammar Ali T M (CPSO#: 91273)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Jun 2009 to 28 Aug 2009
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2009 to 28 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2010 to 28 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2011 to 28 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014