Alseddeeqi, Eiman Mohamed Rafeea M S M (CPSO#: 84132)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2006 to 25 Jun 2006
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2009