Alsefaou, Abdualla Omaro Ab (CPSO#: 75351)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2647
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Anaesthesia
St Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-6485
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abdualla Alsefaou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alsefaou ( CPSO# 75351 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
St Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6485

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDUALLA OMARO AB ALSEFAOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSEFAOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2008