Alshahrani, Ali Mohamed G (CPSO#: 94844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
Division of Cardiology
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 761-5000
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI MOHAMED G ALSHAHRANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSHAHRANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 28 Feb 2011 to 27 Mar 2011
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 17 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 17 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 17 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 09 Nov 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2014