Alshamari, Shoaa Farhan Theyeb (CPSO#: 92253)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Nov 2009 to 25 Jan 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 26 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Nov 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015